**PSEB Class 6 Maths Chapter 1 Knowing Our Numbers Questions and Answers Solution**

PSEB Punjab Board Class 6 Maths Textbook Solution Chapter 1 Knowing Our Numbers Exercise Questions and Answers. We have also included some Additional questions, so that students can prepare more strongly.

**Exercise 1.1**

1.) Write the smallest and the greatest number:

(a) 30900, 30594, 30945, 30495

ANSWER:

We have to find the greatest and the smallest among the 30900, 30594, 30945, and 30495

Smallest Number = 30495

Greatest Number = 30945

(b) 10092, 10029, 10209, 10920

ANSWER:

We have to find the greatest and the smallest among the 10092, 10029, 10209, and 10920

Smallest Number = 10029

Greatest Number = 10920

2.) Arrange the numbers in ascending order:

(a) 6089, 6098, 5231, 3953

ANSWER:

We have to write the numbers in ascending (increasing) order.

The ascending (increasing) order of numbers are 3953, 5231, 6089 and 6098

(b) 49905, 6073, 58904, 7392

ANSWER:

We have to write the numbers in ascending (increasing) order.

The ascending (increasing) order of numbers are 6073, 7392, 49905, 58904

(c) 9801, 25751, 36501, 38802

ANSWER:

We have to write the numbers in ascending (increasing) order.

The ascending (increasing) order of numbers are 9801, 25751, 36501, 38802

3.) Arrange the numbers in descending order:

(a) 75003, 20051, 7600, 60632

ANSWER:

We have to write the numbers in descending (decreasing) order

The descending (decreasing) order of numbers are 75003, 60632, 20051, 7600

(b) 2934, 2834, 667, 3289

ANSWER:

We have to write the numbers in descending (decreasing) order

The descending (decreasing) order of numbers are 3289, 2934, 2834, 667

(c) 1971, 45321, 88715, 92547

ANSWER:

We have to write the numbers in descending (decreasing) order

The descending (decreasing) order of numbers are 92547, 88715, 45321, 1971

4.) Use the given digits without repetition and make the greatest and smallest 4 digit number:

(a) 6, 4, 3, 2

ANSWER:

By using given digit we have to do greatest and smallest 4 digit number.

Greatest 4 digit number: 6432

Smallest 4 digit number: 2346

(b) 9, 7, 0, 3

ANSWER:

By using given digit we have to do greatest and smallest 4 digit number.

Greatest 4 digit number: 9730

Smallest 4 digit number: 3079

(c) 5, 4, 0, 3

ANSWER:

By using given digit we have to do greatest and smallest 4 digit number.

Greatest 4 digit number: 5430

Smallest 4 digit number: 3045

(d) 3, 2, 7, 1

ANSWER:

By using given digit we have to do greatest and smallest 4 digit number.

Greatest 4 digit number: 7321

Smallest 4 digit number: 1237

5.) using any one digit twice make the greatest and the smallest 4 digit number:

(a) 2, 3, 7

ANSWER:

We have to use any one digit twice and the greatest and the smallest 4 digit number.

Greatest 4 digit number: 7732

Smallest 4 digit number: 2237

(b) 5, 0, 3

ANSWER:

We have to use any one digit twice and the greatest and the smallest 4 digit number.

Greatest 4 digit number: 5530

Smallest 4 digit number: 3005

(c) 2, 3, 0

ANSWER:

We have to use any one digit twice and the greatest and the smallest 4 digit number.

Greatest 4 digit number: 3320

Smallest 4 digit number: 2003

(d) 1, 3, 4

ANSWER:

We have to use any one digit twice and the greatest and the smallest 4 digit number.

Greatest 4 digit number: 4431

Smallest 4 digit number: 1134

(e) 2, 5, 8

ANSWER:

We have to use any one digit twice and the greatest and the smallest 4 digit number.

Greatest 4 digit number: 8852

Smallest 4 digit number: 2258

(f) 1, 2, 3

ANSWER:

We have to use any one digit twice and the greatest and the smallest 4 digit number.

Greatest 4 digit number: 3321

Smallest 4 digit number: 1123

6.) Read the following numbers using place value chart:

(a) 638975

ANSWER:

Here, we have to read given numbers using place value chart.

638975 =Six Lakh thirty eight thousand nine hundred seventy five

(b) 84321

ANSWER:

Here, we have to read given numbers using place value chart.

84321 =Eighty four thousand three hundred twenty one

(c) 29061058

ANSWER:

Here, we have to read given numbers using place value chart.

29061058 =Two crore ninety lakh sixty one thousand fifty eight

(d) 60003608

ANSWER:

Here, we have to read given numbers using place value chart.

60003608 =Six crore three thousand six hundred eight

7.) Insert commas suitably and write the names according to Indian system of Numeration:

(a) 98606873

ANSWER:

We have to insert commas suitably and write the names according to Indian system of Numeration.

9, 86, 06,873 = Nine crore eighty six lakh six thousand eight hundred seventy three

(b) 7635172

ANSWER:

We have to insert commas suitably and write the names according to Indian system of Numeration.

76, 35,172 = Seventy six lakh thirty five thousand one hundred seventy two

(c) 89700057

ANSWER:

We have to insert commas suitably and write the names according to Indian system of Numeration.

8.97,00,057 = Eight crore ninety seven lakh fifty seven.

(d) 89322602

ANSWER:

We have to insert commas suitably and write the names according to Indian system of Numeration.

8, 93, 22,602 = Eight crore ninety three lakh twenty two thousand six hundred two.

(e) 4503217

ANSWER:

We have to insert commas suitably and write the names according to Indian system of Numeration.

45, 03,217 = Forty five lakh three thousand two hundred seventeen.

(f) 90032045

ANSWER:

We have to insert commas suitably and write the names according to Indian system of Numeration.

9, 00, 32,045 = Nine crore thirty two thousand forty five.

8.) Insert commas suitably and write the names according to International system of Numeration:

(a) 89832081

ANSWER:

We have to insert commas suitably and write the names according to International system of Numeration.

89,832,081 = Eighty nine million eight hundred thirty two thousand eighty one

(b) 6543374

ANSWER:

We have to insert commas suitably and write the names according to International system of Numeration.

6,543,374 = Six million five hundred forty three thousand three hundred seventy four

(c) 88976306

ANSWER:

We have to insert commas suitably and write the names according to International system of Numeration.

88,976,306 = Eighty eight million nine hundred seventy six thousand three hundred six.

(d) 9860001

ANSWER:

9,860,001 = Nine million eight hundred sixty thousand one

(e) 90032045

ANSWER:

90,032,045 = Ninety million thirty two thousand forty five

(f) 4503217

ANSWER:

4,503,217 = Four million five hundred three thousand two hundred seventeen

9.) Write the number names as numerals:

(a) Seven lakh fifty four thousand

ANSWER:

We have to write given in numbers.

Seven lakh fifty four thousand = 7, 54,000

(b) Nine crore fifty three lakh seventy four thousand five hundred twenty three

ANSWER:

We have to write given in numbers.

Nine crore fifty three lakh seventy four thousand five hundred twenty three = 9, 53, 74,523

(c) Six hundred forty seven thousand five hundred twenty five

ANSWER:

We have to write given in numbers.

Six hundred forty seven thousand five hundred twenty five = 647,525

(d) Seventy two million three hundred thirty two thousand one hundred twelve.

ANSWER:

We have to write given in numbers.

Seventy two million three hundred thirty two thousand one hundred twelve = 72,332, 112

(e) Fifty eight million four hundred twenty three thousand two hundred two.

ANSWER:

We have to write given in numbers.

Fifty eight million four hundred twenty three thousand two hundred two = 58,423,202

(f) Twenty three lakh thirty thousand ten.

ANSWER:

We have to write given in numbers.

Twenty three lakh thirty thousand ten = 23, 30,010

10.) How many eight digit numbers are there in all.

ANSWER:

There are total 90000000 eight digit numbers.

11.) Fill in the blanks:

(a) 1 Lakh = —- ten thousand

ANSWER:

1 Lakh = ** 10** ten thousand

(b) 1 Million = ——- hundred thousand

ANSWER:

1 Million = ** 10** hundred thousand

(c) 1 Crore = ——- ten lakh

ANSWER:

1 Crore = ** 10** ten lakh

(d) 1 Crore = —– million

ANSWER:

1 Crore = ** 10** million

(e) 1 Million = —– lakh

ANSWER:

1 Million = ** 10** lakh

**Exercise 1.2**

1.) Convert the following measurements as directed:

(a) 5 km into metre

ANSWER:

We have to convert 5 km into metre.

We know,

1 km = 1000 m

**5 km = 5000 metre.**

** **

(b) 35 kilometre into metre

ANSWER:

We have to convert 5 km into metre.

We know,

1 km = 1000 m

35 km = 35 x 1000 metre.

**35 km = 35000 metre.**

** **

(c) 2000 milligram into gram

ANSWER:

We have to convert 2000 milligram into gram

We know,

1 gram = 1000 milligram

**2000 milligram = 2 gram**

** **

(d) 500 decigram into gram

ANSWER:

We have to convert 500 decigram into gram

We know,

500 decigram = ** 50** gram

(e) 2000 millilitre into litre

ANSWER:

We have to convert 2000 millilitre into litre

We know,

1 litre = 1000 millilitre

**2000 millilitre = 2 litre**

** **

(f) 12 kilolitre into litre

ANSWER:

We have to convert 12 kilolitre into litre

We know,

1 kilolitre = 1000 litre

**12 kilolitre = 12000 litre**

** **

2.) In an election, the successful candidate registered 6317 votes whereas his nearest rival could attain only 3761 votes. By what margin did the successful candidates defeat his rival?

ANSWER:

Given that,

The successful candidate registered 6317 votes whereas his nearest rival could attain only 3761 votes.

We have to find what margin did the successful candidates defeat his rival.

Margin did the successful candidates defeat his rival = 6317 votes – 3761 votes.

**Margin did the successful candidates defeat his rival = 2556 votes.**

** **

3.) A monthly magazine having 37 pages is published on 20th day of each month. This month 23791 copies were printed. Tell us how many pages were printed in all?

ANSWER:

Given that,

A monthly magazine having 37 pages is published on 20th day of each month. This month 23791 copies were printed.

We have to find how many pages were printed in all.

Pages were printed in all =23791 copies x 37 pages

**Pages were printed in all = 8, 80, 267 pages**

4.) A shopkeeper has 37 reams. One ream contain 480 pages and he wants to make quires of all these sheets to sell in retail. One quire of sheets contain 24 sheets. How many quires will be made?

ANSWER:

Given that,

A shopkeeper has 37 reams.

One ream contain 480 pages.

One quire of sheets contain 24 sheets.

We have to find how many quires will be made.

Total pages = 37 reams x 480 pages.

Total pages = 17,760 pages.

One quire of sheets contain 24 sheets.

No. of quires will be made = 17,760 pages. / 24 sheets.

**No. of quires will be made = 740**

** **

5.) Veerpal serves milk to the guests in glasses of capacity 250 ml each. Suppose that the glasses are filled to capacity and there was 5 litre milk that got consumed. How many guests were served with milk?

ANSWER:

Given that,

Veerpal serves milk to the guests in glasses of capacity 250 ml each.

The glasses are filled to capacity and there was 5 litre milk that got consumed

We have to find how many guests were served with milk.

We know,

1 litre = 1000 ml

5 litre = 5000 ml

Guests were served with milk = 5000 ml / 250 ml

**Guests were served with milk = 20**

6.) A box of medicine contain 2, 00,000 tablets each weighing 20mg. What is the total weight of tablets in box?

ANSWER:

Given that,

A box of medicine contain 2, 00,000 tablets each weighing 20mg.

We have to find the total weight of tablets in box

The total weight of tablets in box = 2, 00,000 tablets x 20mg.

The total weight of tablets in box = 40, 00,000 mg.

**The total weight of tablets in box = 4 kg.**

7.) A bookstore sold books worth Rupees Two lakh eighty five thousand eight hundred ninety one in the first week of June. They sold books worth Rupees Four lakh seven hundred sixty eight in the second week of June. How much was the total sale for two weeks together?

ANSWER:

Given that,

A bookstore sold books worth Rupees Two lakh eighty five thousand eight hundred ninety one in the first week of June.

They sold books worth Rupees Four lakh seven hundred sixty eight in the second week of June.

We have to find the total sale for two weeks together

The total sale for two weeks together = Two lakh eighty five thousand eight hundred ninety one + Four lakh seven hundred sixty eight

The total sale for two weeks together = 2, 85,891 + 4, 00,768

**The total sale for two weeks together = 6, 86,659**

** **

8.) A famous cricket player has so far scored 6978 runs in test matches. He wishes to complete 10,000 runs. How many more runs he need?

ANSWER:

Given that,

A famous cricket player has so far scored 6978 runs in test matches.

He wishes to complete 10,000 runs.

We have to find how many more runs he need.

Runs he need to complete 10,000 runs = 10,000 runs – 6978 runs

**Runs he need to complete 10,000 runs = 3022**

9.) Surinder has78592 with him. He placed an order for purchasing 39 radio sets at 1234 each. How much money will remain with him after the purchase?

ANSWER:

Given that,

Surinder has 78592 with him.

He placed an order for purchasing 39 radio sets at 1234 each.

Total amount of 39 radio sets = 39 radio sets x Rs.1234

**Total amount of 39 radio sets = Rs.48, 126**

We have to find how much money will remain with him after the purchase.

Money will remain with him after the purchase = 78592 – Rs.48, 126

**Money will remain with him after the purchase = Rs.30, 466**

10.) A vessel has 3 litre 650 ml of curd. In how many glasses each of 25 ml capacity can it be distributed?

ANSWER:

Given that,

A vessel has 3 litre 650 ml of curd.

We have to find how many glasses each of 25 ml capacity can it be distributed

Glasses each of 25 ml capacity can it be distributed = 3 litre 650 ml / 25 ml capacity

We know,

1 litre = 1000 ml

**3 litre = 3000 ml**

Glasses each of 25 ml capacity can it be distributed = 3650 ml / 25 ml capacity

**Glasses each of 25 ml capacity can it be distributed = 146**

** **

__Exercise 1.3__

__Exercise 1.3__

1.) Estimate each of the following using general rule:

(a) 837 +987

ANSWER:

Here we have to solve given using general rule.

General rule is that rounding off each factor to greater place.

837 rounding off using general rule = 800

987 rounding off using general rule = 1000

837 + 987 = 800 + 1000

**837 + 987 = 1800**

** **

(b) 783-427

ANSWER:

Here we have to solve given using general rule.

General rule is that rounding off each factor to greater place.

783 rounding off using general rule = 800

427 rounding off using general rule = 400

783 -427 = 800 – 400

**783 – 427= 400**

** **

(c) 1391 +2783

ANSWER:

Here we have to solve given using general rule.

General rule is that rounding off each factor to greater place.

1391 rounding off using general rule = 1000

2783 rounding off using general rule = 3000

1391 +2783 = 1000 + 3000

**1391 +2783 = 4000**

** **

(d) 28292-21496

ANSWER:

Here we have to solve given using general rule.

General rule is that rounding off each factor to greater place.

28292 rounding off using general rule = 30000

21496 rounding off using general rule = 20000

28292-21496 = 30000 – 20000

**28292-21496 = 10,000**

** **

2.) Estimate the product using general rule:

(a) 898 x 785

ANSWER:

Here we have to solve given using general rule.

General rule is that rounding off each factor to greater place, then multiplying the rounded off number.

898 rounded off to nearest hundredth = 900

785 rounded off to nearest hundredth = 800

898 x 785 = 900 x 800

**898 x 785 = 7, 20,000**

** **

(b) 9 x 795

ANSWER:

Here we have to solve given using general rule.

General rule is that rounding off each factor to greater place, then multiplying the rounded off number.

9 rounded off to nearest tenth = 10

795 rounded off to nearest hundredth = 800

9 x 795= 10 x 800

**9 x 795 = 8000**

** **

(c) 87 x 317

ANSWER:

Here we have to solve given using general rule.

General rule is that rounding off each factor to greater place, then multiplying the rounded off number.

87rounded off to nearest tenth = 90

317 rounded off to nearest hundredth = 300

87 x 317 = 90 x 300

**87 x 317 = 27000**

(d) 9250 x 29

ANSWER:

Here we have to solve given using general rule.

9250 rounded off to nearest thousandth = 9000

29 rounded off to nearest tenth= 30

9250 x 29= 9000 x 30

**9250 x 29 = 2, 70,000**

** **

- Estimate by rounding off to nearest hundred:

(a) 439+334+4317

ANSWER:

Here, we have to solve given by rounding off to nearest hundred.

We rounding off 439 + 334 + 4317.

439 + 334 + 4317 = 400 + 300 + 4300

**439 + 334 + 4317 = 5000**

** **

(b) 108734-47599

ANSWER:

Here, we have to solve given by rounding off to nearest hundred.

We rounding off 108734-47599

108734-47599 = 108700 – 47600

**108734-47599 = 61,100**

** **

4.) Estimate by rounding off to nearest tens:

(a) 439+334+4317

ANSWER:

Here, we have to solve given by rounding off to nearest tens.

We rounding off 439+334+4317

439 + 334 + 4317 = 440 + 330 + 4320

**439 + 334 + 4317 = 5090**

(b) 108734-47599

ANSWER:

Here, we have to solve given by rounding off to nearest tens.

We rounding off 108734-47599

108734-47599 = 108730 – 47600

**108734-47599 = 61,130**

** **

__Exercise 1.4__

__Exercise 1.4__

1.) Simplify each of following:

(a) 13 x 104

ANSWER:

We have to simplify 13 x 104

We write 104 = (100 + 4)

13 x 104 = 13 x (100 + 4)

13 x 100 + 13 x 4

1300 + 52

**13 x 104 = 1352**

** **

(b) 102 x 105

ANSWER:

We have to simplify 102 x 105

We write 105 = (100 + 5)

102 x 105 = 102 x (100 + 5)

102 x 100 + 102 x 5

10200 + 510

**102 x 105 = 10710**

** **

(c) 6 x 107

ANSWER:

We have to simplify 6 x 107

We write 107 = (100 + 7)

6 x 107 = 6 x (100 + 7)

6 x 100 + 6 x 7

600 + 42

**6 x 107 = 642**

** **

(d) 16 x 106

ANSWER:

We have to simplify 16 x 106

We write 106 = (100 + 6)

16 x 106 = 16 x (100 + 6)

16 x 100 + 16 x 6

1600 + 96

**16 x 106 = 1696**

** **

(e) 201 x 205

ANSWER:

We have to simplify 201 x 205

We write 205 = (200 + 5)

201 x 205 = 201 x (200 + 5)

201 x 205 = 201 x 200 + 201 x 5

201 x 205 = 40200 + 1005

**201 x 205 = 41205**

(f) 22 x 102

ANSWER:

We have to simplify 22 x 102

We write 102 = (100 + 2)

22 x 102 = 22 x (100 + 2)

22 x 100 + 22 x 2

2200 + 44

**22 x 102 = 2244**

** **

(g) 6 x (4 + 3)

ANSWER:

We have to simplify 6 x (4 + 3)

6 x (4 + 3) = 6 x 7

6 x (4 + 3) = 42

(h) (17 – 9) x 3

ANSWER:

We have to simplify (17 – 9) x 3

(17 – 9) x 3 = 8 x 3

**(17 – 9) x 3 = 24**

(i) (20 + 4) / 2

ANSWER:

We have to simplify (20 + 4) / 2

**(20 + 4) / 2 = 24 / 2 = 12**

** **

__Exercise 1.5__

__Exercise 1.5__

1.) Which of the following are meaningless:

(a) IC

ANSWER:

IC is meaningless.

(b) VD

ANSWER:

VD is meaningless.

(c) XCVII

ANSWER:

XCVII = 97

(d) IVC

ANSWER:

IVC is meaningless.

(e) XM

ANSWER:

XM is meaningless.

2.) Write the following in Hindu Arabic Numerals:

(a) XXV

ANSWER:

We have to write given roman numbers in Hindu Arabic Numerals.

**XXV = 25**

** **

(b) XLV

ANSWER:

We have to write given roman numbers in Hindu Arabic Numerals.

**XLV = 45**

(c) LXXIX

ANSWER:

We have to write given roman numbers in Hindu Arabic Numerals.

**LXXIX = 79**

(d) XCIX

ANSWER:

We have to write given roman numbers in Hindu Arabic Numerals.

**XCIX = 99**

(e) CLXIV

ANSWER:

We have to write given roman numbers in Hindu Arabic Numerals.

**CLXIV = 164**

(f) DCLXII

ANSWER:

We have to write given roman numbers in Hindu Arabic Numerals.

**DCLXII = 662**

(g) DLXIX

ANSWER:

We have to write given roman numbers in Hindu Arabic Numerals.

**DLXIX = 569**

(h) DCCLXVI

ANSWER:

We have to write given roman numbers in Hindu Arabic Numerals.

**DCCLXVI = 766**

(i) CDXXXVIII

ANSWER:

We have to write given roman numbers in Hindu Arabic Numerals.

**CDXXXVIII = 438**

(j) MCCXLVI

ANSWER:

We have to write given roman numbers in Hindu Arabic Numerals.

**MCCXLVI = 1246**

** **

3.) Express each of the following as Roman numerals:

(a) 29

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

29 = XXIX

(b) 63

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**63 = LXIII**

(c) 94

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**94 = XCIV**

** **

(d) 99

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**99 = XCIX**

(e) 156

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**156 = CLVI**

** **

(f) 293

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**293 = CCXCIII**

(g) 472

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**472 = CDLXXII**

(h) 638

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**638 = DCXXXVIII**

(i) 1458

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**1458 = MCDLVIII**

(j) 948

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**948 = CMXLVIII**

(k) 199

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**199 = CXCIX**

(l) 499

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**499 = CDXCIX**

** **

(m) 699

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**699 = DCXCIX**

(n) 299

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**299 = CCXCIX**

** **

(o) 999

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**999 = CMXCIX**

** **

(p) 1000

ANSWER:

We have to write given number in Roman numerals.

**1000 = M**

** **

Multiple Choice Questions

1.) The number of digits are

(a) 9

(b) 10

(c) 8

(d) Infinite

ANSWER: (b) 10

2.) The greatest 4 digit number using 1, 5, 2, 9 once is

(a) 9215

(b) 9512

(c) 5912

(d) 9521

ANSWER: (d) 9521

3.) The smallest 4 digit number using 2, 0, 3, 7 once is

(a) 0237

(b) 2037

(c) 7320

(d) 7023

ANSWER: (b) 2037

4.) Which of the following are in ascending order?

(a) 217, 271, 127, 721

(b) 217, 127, 721, 271

(c) 127, 217, 271, 721

(d) 721, 271, 217, 127

ANSWER: (c) 127, 217, 271, 721

5.) The face value of digit 4 in 23468 is:

(a) 4

(b) 400

(c) 40

(d) 468

ANSWER: (a) 4

6.) The place value of digit 2 in 4123 is

(a) 23

(b) 2

(c) 20

(d) 200

ANSWER: (c) 20

7.) The difference between place value and face value of 5 in 76542 is:

(a) 537

(b) 45

(c) 0

(d) 495

ANSWER: (d) 495

8.5 x 10000 + 3 x 100 + 2 x 10 + 2 =

(a) 5322

(b) 53022

(c) 50322

(d) 53202

ANSWER: (c) 50322

9.) Four lakh two thousand three hundred fifty one =

(a) 42351

(b) 402351

(c) 420351

(d) 4002351

ANSWER: (b) 402351

10.) How many four digit numbers are there?

(a) 9999

(b) 9900

(c) 9000

(d) 9990

ANSWER: (c) 9000

11.) Seventeen million twenty four thousand fifty four =

(a) 172454

(b) 170024054

(c) 170240054

(d) 17024054

ANSWER: (d) 17024054

12.) 1 Crore =—– million

(a) 1

(b) 10

(c) 100

(d) 1000

ANSWER: (b) 10

13.) Rounded off 7213 to nearest thousands.

(a) 7200

(b) 7000

(c) 7210

(d) 7213

ANSWER: (b) 7000

14.) Rounded off 45553 to nearest hundreds.

(a) 45500

(b) 45550

(c) 45600

(d) 45650

ANSWER: (c) 45600

15.) Solve; (9-4) x 6 =……….

(a) 30

(b) 54

(c) 78

(d) 64

ANSWER: (a) 30

16.) Which of the following number does not have symbol in Roman numerals?

(a) 0

(b) 1

(c) 10

(d) 1000

ANSWER: (a) 0

17.) How many symbols are used in Roman Numerals?

(a) 5

(b) 8

(c) 9

(d) 7

ANSWER: (d) 7

18.) Which of the following are meaningless?

(a) LXIX

(b) XC

(c) IL

(d) LI

ANSWER: (c) IL

19.) CLXVI =

(a) 164

(b) 144

(c) 176

(d) 166

ANSWER: (d) 166

20.) XCIX+XLVI=

(a) CVL

(b) CLV

(c) CXLV

(d) CXLIV

ANSWER: (c) CXLV