Vedic Math

Vedic Mathematics:

Vedic mathematics is the advanced technology which has lots of formulae and sutras which helps us in doing numerical easily and quickly. It includes short tricks, arithmetical logic, reasoning tricks, number theory tricks and all the short cut methods which mostly requires us in doing maths daily.

It is very important to learn Vedic maths at the school level which enhances our curiosity and makes children intelligent. By using Vedic math we can solve lots of problems which increases our decision making ability.

From many years ago, Vedic maths was developed and implemented also. It’s also interesting to learn and teach Vedic math.

Advantages of Vedic mathematics:

  • Vedic maths increases the intellectual capacity of our brain.
  • Daily doing maths by using Vedic math short trick increases the speed of solving math problems.
  • It involves some mental math techniques by which we can do maths in our mind within a fraction of seconds.
  • Also it has vast of application in calculus, coordinate geometry, algebraic mathematics.
  • Vedic math techniques increases our concentration and determination towards the skill.

1) Short trick for addition of numbers in Vedic math:

  • When we have to add some numbers then we have not to do maths directly but logically we can find answer accurately and quickly.
  • Let us understand the Vedic math techniques.

For example:

1) If we have to find 74+89=? In few seconds, then we can use mental Vedic math techniques as follows.

Here, nearest number to 74 is 70 and nearest number to 89 is 90.

Thus, first we add 70+90=160

But, instead of 74 we have taken 70 that’s why again we add 4. And instead of 89 we have taken 90 that’s why we subtract 1 also.

Thus, 160+4-1= 160+3= 163

Hence, 74+89=163

 

2) If we have to find 88+54+23+49=? Let us see.

We can write also like following,

80+50+20+40= 190

And 8+4+3+9= 24

Thus, 190+24= 190+20+4= 214

Hence, 88+54+23+49= 214

 

3) If we have to find 13.5 + 12.56 + 18.08=?

Then we do calculations as shown below.

First we add whole number part and then decimal number part and then we find the total addition.

Thus, 13+12+18=43

And 0.50+0.56+0.80= 1.86

Thus, 43+1.86= 44.86

In this way, we can find addition by our own mental math techniques.

 

4) If we have to find 609 + 345+234+699=? Then we can find in following way also.

600+300+200+700= 1800

And, 9+45+34-1= 9+40+5+33= 9+40+5+30+3= 87

Thus, 1800 + 87= 1887

2) Short trick for subtraction of any numbers by using Vedic math techniques:

Addition is easier than subtraction. But by using mental math techniques we can easily find subtraction also.

1) If we have to find 578-234=?

Then, we write as follows.

578-234= (500+70+8)-(200+30+4)

= (500-200) + (70-30) + (8-4)

= 300+40+4= 344

Thus, 578-234=344

In this way we can find subtraction also without using rough paper for calculations or without using calculator.

2) If we have to find 58.98-1.23-23.40=?

Then we can find out as shown below.

We take first only whole number part and then decimal part as given below.

58-1-23=58-24= (50-20) + (8-4) =30+4=34

And, 0.98-0.23-0.40= 0.98-0.63=0.35

Thus, 34+0.35=34.35

Hence, 58.98-1.23-23.40= 34.35

3) If we have to find 980-408+345=?

Then, we write as

900+80-400-8+300+45= (900+80+300+45)-(400+8)

= (1200+125)-(408)

= (1200-400) + (125-8)

= 800+117=917

Thus, 980-408+345= 917

3) Short trick for multiplication of numbers by using Vedic mental math techniques:

1) Trick for multiplying any numbers:

For example:

  • We have to find,

23*4= (20+3)*4= 20*4+3*4= 80+12=92

 

  • If we have to find, 45*34=?

Then we proceed as follows.

(40+5)*(30+4) = (40*30) + (40*4) + (5*30) + (5*4)

= 1200+ 160+150+20

= 1360+170= 1360+100+70= 1460+70= 1530

Thus, 45*34= 1530

In this way, we can find multiplication of any numbers by our own way easily and accurately.

If we have more practiced this tricks in our daily maths then we can solve problems by using Vedic maths quickly and accurately.

2) Trick for multiplication of any number with 5:

It is easy to multiply any number with 10 than 5.

Hence, we can write 5 as 10/2.

For example:

  • If we have to find 23*5=?

Then, we write here 5 as 10/2.

Thus, 23*5= 23*10/2= 230/2= 115

Thus, by multiplying with 10 first and then making that answer half we can easily find multiplication with 5.

  • If we have to find 567*5=?

Then, we proceed as follows.

567*5= 567*10/2= 5670/2= 2835

  • If we have to find, 9.8*5=? Then,

9.8*5 = 9.8*10/2 = 98/2= 49

3) Short trick for multiplication of any number with 25:

We can multiply any number with 100 more easily than 25. Thus here we write 25 as 100/4.

For example:

  • If we have to find, 45*25=? Then we write as follows.

45*100/4= 11.25*100= 1125

In this way, we can easily calculate the answers quickly and accurately.

If we have to find, 678*25=? Then

678*25= 678*100/4= 169.5*100= 16950

This is the correct answer.

  • If we have to find, 9.8*25=? Then,

9.8*25= 9.8*100/4= 2.45*100= 245

In this way, we can use this mental math technique for multiplication of decimal numbers with 25 also. By practicing more we get the perfection.

4) Short trick for multiplication of any number with 11:

If we have to multiply any two digit number with 11, then first we write the ending numbers as it is and then by taking successive numbers addition from left we write unit digit only, and the other than unit digit number we take a carry it.

To understand more clearly see the following example.

  • If we have to find, 34*11=?

Then

Here ending numbers are 3 and 4. We write them as it is.

And 3+4=7 we write in between them thus our answer become,

34*11= 374

And this is the correct answer.

  • If we have to find, 78*11=? Then,

Here ending numbers are 7 and 8, we write them as it is.

And take addition of successive number, here 7+8=15 we write 5 and carry 1 to 7.

Thus, 78*11= 7 (7+8) 8

= 7 15 8

= 858

Thus, 78*11= 858

In this way, we can multiply any digit number with 11 by using this short trick.

5) Short trick for squaring of any number ending with 5:

The formula for finding square of any number ending with 5 is,

(N5)2 = N*(N+1), 25

Here, N is the number other than 5.

For example:

  • (15)2 = ?

Here, N=1 hence we write as, (15)2= 1*(1+1), 25 = 2, 25= 225

Thus, (15)2= 225

 

  • Similarly, we find square of 25 also.

Here, N = 2, hence we can write,

(25)2= 2*(2+1), 25

= 2*3, 25= 6, 25= 625

Thus, (25)2= 625

In this way, we can find square of any digit number ending with 5.

 

For example:

(115)2 = ?

Here, N = 11

Thus, (115)2= 11*12, 25

Since, 11*12= 11*10+11*2= 110+22=132

Thus, (115)2= 132, 25= 13225

This is the exact answer we got.


Updated: July 22, 2021 — 9:10 pm

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *

two + nineteen =