# Multiplication Magic of 9: 1 to 5 Digits

## Multiplication Magic of 9: 1 to 5 Digits

Multiplication with numbers like 9, 99, 999, or 9999, and so on, is another unique example of the operation. It seems that the calculation will be difficult if multiplier is a large number. By using the method given below, we can multiply any number with 99,999,9999, etc. very quickly.

Multiplication with 9 is always fun. We can use addition and subtraction to solve the multiplication of any number with “n” digits of 9.

One of the two numbers used in a multiplication is the multiplicand, and the other is the multiplier.

For example, 22 x 99. In this 22 is multiplicand and 99 is multiplier.

Steps for multiplication of 9,99,999…..

1) Subtract 1 from the multiplicand.

2) Subtract the answer of step 1 from 9’s series number

It is that simple.

Let’s examine this through a illustration now: –

1) 7 X 9 = 63

7      Here 7 is the multiplicand.

X    9      7 – 1 = 6

_____________

63     next Subtract the answer from multiplier.

9 – 6 = 3

2) 5 x 9 = 45

5      Here 5 is the multiplicand.

X   9       5 – 1=4

_____________

45     next Subtract the answer from multiplier.

9 – 4 = 3

3)   13 x 99 = 1287

13     Here 13 is the multiplicand.

X 99     13 – 1 = 12

_____________

1287    next Subtract the answer from multiplier.

99 – 12 = 87

4)  84 x 99 = 8316

84       Here 84 is the multiplicand.

X    99      84 – 1 = 83

_____________

8316     next Subtract the answer from multiplier.

99 – 83 = 16

5) 343 x 999 = 342657

343    Here 343 is the multiplicand.

X     999    343 – 1 = 342

_____________

342657    next Subtract the answer from multiplier.

999 – 342=657

6) 482 x 999 = 481518

482    Here 482 is the multiplicand.

X      999   482 – 1 = 481

_____________

481518    next Subtract the answer from multiplier.

999 – 481=518

7) 7852 x 9999 = 78512148

7852   Here 7852 is the multiplicand.

X      9999    7852 – 1 = 7851

_____________

78512148   next Subtract the answer from multiplier.

9999 – 7851=2148

8) 3311 x 9999 = 33106689

3311    Here 3311 is the multiplicand.

X      9999    3311 – 1=3310

_____________

33106689   next Subtract the answer from multiplier.

9999 – 3311=6689