**Multiplication Magic of 11: 1 to 8 Digits**

The magic of 11 is the Trick you can use when you have any number or any digit number multiplied by 11. The practicing of this Trick method can improve your memory and will help you to speed up your calculation. It can also benefit you while you try to crack the Trick games like Sudoku. Each values have different number of Digits; following are the methods explained that are applicable to number of 1,2,3,4,5 digits and so on.

**Magic of 11 with 2-Digit Number.**

1) 72

× 11

______

792

1.) Jot down the unit’s place number which is multiplied by 11. i.e., 2

2.) Then Leave a blank space and Jot Down the tens place number, i.e., 7

3.) Make an addition of those two numbers i.e., 7+2= 9. Jot down 9 in the Blank space.

4.) Hence the result of 72 multiplied by 11 is 792.

*Let us multiply 34 to 11*

34

× 11

______

743

1.) Jot down the unit’s place number which is multiplied by 11. i.e., 3

2.) Then Leave a blank space and Jot Down the tens place number, i.e., 4

3.) Make an addition of those two numbers i.e., 3+4= 7. Jot down 7 in the Blank space.

4.) Hence the result of 34 multiplied by 11 is 743

If the answer value of addition is more than ‘9’ or any 2-digit number, the number is (carried-forward) and then added with the next number.

*Let us see 37 multiplied by 11.*

37

× 11

______

407

1.) Jot down the number in unit’s place.

2.) Make an addition of number in units place and tens place, i.e., 3+7=10.; jot down ‘0’ and carry forward ‘1’ to make an addition with number in tens place i.e., 3+1=4

3.) Hence 37×11=407.

Let us multiply 89 to 11.

89

× 11

______

979

1.) Jot down number ‘9’, the number in unit’s place.

2.) Make an addition of unit’s place number to tens place number 9+8=17.

3.) Jot down 7 from ‘17’ and carry forward ‘1’.

4.) Make an addition of tens place number with carry forward number, i.e., 1+8=9.

5.) Hence our result of 89×11= 979.

**Magic of 11 with 3-Digit numbers**

Let us multiply 253 to 11.

253

× 11

______

2783

1.) Jot down the number in the units place i.e., 3

2.) Make an addition of number in units place and tens place, i.e., 3+5=8 and jot it down.

3.) Next step is to make an addition of numbers in tens place with hundreds place. 5+2=7.

4.) Last step is to Jot down number in Hundreds place as itis .i.e. 2

Hence 253 multiplied by 11 is 2783.

**Let us solve 352 × 11.**

352

× 11

______

3872

1.) Jot down the number in the units place i.e., 2

2.) Make an addition of number in units place and tens place, i.e., 5+2=7 and Jot it down.

3.) Next step is to make an addition of numbers in tens place with hundreds place. 5+3=8.

4.) Last step is to Jot down number in Hundreds place as it is, .i.e. 3

5.) Hence 352 multiplied by 11 is 3872.

**Magic of 11 multiplied with 4-digit number**

2244

× 11

______

24684

1.) Jot down number in units place, i.e, 4

2.) Make an addition of number in units place and tens place.i.e., 4+4=8.

3.) Jot down, make an addition of number in tens place and hundreds place.

4.) 4+2= 6.

5.) Jot down make an addition of number in hundreds place and thousands place, i.e., 2+2=4.

6.) Jot down number in the thousands place i.e., 2.

7.) Hence the result of 2244×11 is 24684.

5223 multiplied by 11

5223

× 11

______

57453

1.) Jot down number in units place, i.e, 3

2.) Make an addition of number in units place and tens place.i.e., 3+2=5

3.) Jot down, make an addition of number in tens place and hundreds place i.e, 2+2=4

4.)

5.) Jot down make an addition of number in hundreds place and thousands place, i.e., 5+2=7

6.) Jot down number in the thousands place i.e., 5

7.) Hence the result of 5223 ×11= 57453.

**The magic of 11 with 5-Digit number.**

98277

× 11

______

1081047

1.) Jot down the number in units place that is 7

2.) Make an addition of number in units place and tens place that is 7+7=14.

3.) If the value is 2-digit number, jot down units place number that is 4 and carry forward next with next number that is 1

4.) Make an addition of number in tens place and hundreds place that is 7+2=9.

5.) Make an addition of carry forward number with 9+1=10.

6.) Mention number in units place that is 0 and carry forward the rest value.

7.) Make an addition of hundreds place number to thousands place that is 2+8=10.

8.) Add a carry forward number to the value that is 10+1=11

9.) Jot down 1 of 11 and carry forward ‘1’.

Make an addition of carry forward number that is 9+1=10 and mention ‘0’ and carry forward ‘1’

Make an addition of last lakh place number to carry forward that is 9+1=10 . Jot down 10.

Hence the result of 98277×11 is 1081047.