Maharashtra Board Class 5 Math Solution Chapter 4 – Multiplication and Division
Balbharati Maharashtra Board Class 5 Math Solution Chapter 4: Multiplication and Division. Marathi or English Medium Students of Class 5 get here Multiplication and Division full Exercise Solution.
Std |
Maharashtra Class 5 |
Subject |
Math Solution |
Chapter |
Multiplication and Division |
PROBLEM SET 14
Multiply
(1) 327 × 92
(2) 807 × 126
2.) As part of the ‘Avoid Plastic’ campaign, each of 745 students made 25 paper bags. What was the total number of paper bags made ?
Total number of students = 745
Paper bags made by each student = 25
The total number of paper bags (745×25)
ANSWER = Total number of 18625 paper bags were made by students.
3.) In a plantation, saplings of 215 medicinal trees have been planted in each of the 132 rows of trees. How many saplings are there in the plantation altogether ?
Total number of rows trees = 132
Trees in each row = 215
Calculating the Total number of saplings by multiplying the number of rows with the number of saplings in each row
(132×215)
Answer = There are 28,380 saplings in the plantation altogether.
4) One computer costs 27,540 rupees. How much will 18 such computers cost ?
Price of one computer = 27540 rupees
Calculating the total price by multiplying the price of one computer with the number of computer (27540×18)
Answer = 18 computers will cost 4,95,720 rupees.
5. Under the ‘Inspire Awards’ scheme, 5000 rupees per student were granted for the purchase of science project materials. If 154 students in a certain taluka were covered under the scheme, find the total amount granted to that taluka.
Total number of students = 154
Per student money granted = 5000 rupees
Calculating total amount, (154×5000
Answer = The total amount granted 7,70,000 rupees.
6. If a certain two-wheeler costs 53,670 rupees, how much will 35 such two-wheelers cost ?
The price of two-wheeler = 53,670 rupees
Total price of 35 two-wheeler (53670×35)
Answer = the price of 35 two-wheeler is 18,78,450 rupees.
7) One hour has 3,600 seconds. How many seconds do 365 hours have ?
One hour = 3600 seconds
So the total seconds in 365 hours (3600×365)
8. Frame a multiplication word problem with the numbers 5473 and 627 and solve it.
Multiplying (5473×627)
9. Find the product of the biggest three-digit number and the biggest four-digit number
Biggest three digit number 999
Biggest four digit number 9999
10. One traveller incurs a cost of 7,650 rupees for a certain journey. What will be the cost for 26 such travellers ?
One traveller’s journey cost = 7650 rupees
So calculating the cost of 26 traveller (7650×26)
Answer = it will cost 19,89,000 rupees
PROBLEM SET 15
1. Solve the following and write the quotient and remainder.
(1) 1284 ÷ 32
(2) 5586 ÷ 87
(3) 1207 ÷ 27
Answer = Quotient 44, Remainder 19
(4) 8543 ÷ 41
Answer = quotient 208, remainder 15
(5) 2304 ÷ 43
Answer = quotient 53, remainder 25.
(6) 56,741 ÷ 26
Answer = quotient 2182, remainder 9.
2. How many hours will it take to travel 336 km at a speed of 48 km per hour ?
Speed of travel = 48 km per hour
Distance of travel = 336 km per hour
Dividing the total distance by the speed of travel (336÷48)
Answer = It will take 7 hour to travel.
3. Girija needed 35 cartons to pack 1400 books. There are an equal number of books in every carton. How many books did she pack into each carton ?
Number of cartons = 35
Number of books to pack = 1400
Dividing the total number of books by the number of cartons (1400÷35)
Answer = she packed 40 books in each carton.
4. The contribution for a picnic was 65 rupees each. Altogether, 2925 rupees were collected. How many had paid for the picnic ?
Total amount collected = 2925 rupees
Contribution of each person = 65 rupees
Dividing the total amount by the contribution of each person (2925÷65)
Answer = 45 people has paid for the picnic.
5. Which number, on being multiplied by 56, gives a product of 9688 ?
6. If 48 sheets are required for making one notebook, how many notebooks at the most will 5880 sheets make and how many sheets will be left over ?
One notebook consists of = 48 sheets
Total number of sheets = 5880
Dividing the total number of sheets by the sheet takes to make one notebook (5880 ÷ 48)
Answer = 122 notebooks could be make with 5880 sheets and 24 sheets will be left over.
7) What will the quotient be when the smallest five-digit number is divided by the smallest four-digit number?
Smallest five digit number = 11111
Smallest four digit number = 1111
Answer = the quotient will be 1.
PROBLEM SET 16
1.) From a total of 10,000 rupees, Anna donated 7,000 rupees to a school. The remaining amount was to be divided equally among six students as the ‘all-round student’ prize. What was the amount of each prize ?
Total amount = 10000 rupees
Money donated by Anna = 7000 rupees
Subtracting the amount donated by anna from the total amount (10000-7000)
1 | ||||
1
– |
0
7 |
0
0 |
0
0 |
0
0 |
0 | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
Remaining amount = 3000 rupees
Dividing the remaining amount 3000 rupees with 6 students (3000 ÷ 6)
Answer = amount of each prize is 500 rupees.
2.) An amount of 260 rupees each was collected from 50 students for a picnic. If 11,450 rupees were spent for the picnic, what is the amount left over ?
Total number of student = 50
Amount collected from each student =260 rupees
Total amount (260× 50)
260 ×50 |
000 +13000 |
13000 |
So the total amount collected 13,000 rupees
Amount spent on picnic = 11450 rupees
So subtracting the amount spent from the total amount
(13000-11450)
1 | 1 | |||
1
1 |
3
1 |
0
4 |
0
5 |
0
0 |
0 | 1 | 5 | 5 | 0 |
Answer = 1550 rupees were left over
3.) A shopkeeper bought a sack of 50kg of sugar for 1750 rupees. As the price of sugar fell, he had to sell it at the rate of 32 rupees per kilo. How much less money did he get than he had spent?
He bought 50 kg sugar for 1750 rupees.
After the price drops he sold the sugar for 32 rupees per kilo.
So multiplying the total amount of sugar with per kilo selling price (50 × 32)
50
×32 |
100
+1500 |
1600 |
So he sold all the sugar for 1600 rupees.
Subtracting the selling price from the buying price (1750-1600)
1
1 |
7
6 |
5
0 |
0
0 |
0 | 1 | 5 | 0 |
Answer = 150 rupees less money he get.
4.) A shopkeeper bought 7 pressure cookers at the rate of 1870 rupees per cooker. He sold them all for a total of 14,230 rupees. Did he get less or more money than he had spent ?
Number of pressure cooker = 7
Price of one pressure cooker = 1870 rupees
Multiplying the total number if cookers with the price of one pressure cooker to get the total buying price (7×1870)
1870
×7 |
13090 |
Total buying price = 13090 rupees
He sold them for = 14230 rupees
Calculating the difference between the selling price and buying price (14230-13090)
1 | ||||
1
1 |
4
3 |
2
0 |
3
9 |
0
0 |
0 | 1 | 1 | 4 | 0 |
Answer = he get more 1140 rupees than he had spent.
5.) Fourteen families in a Society together bought 8 sacks of wheat, each weighing 98 kilos. If they shared all the wheat equally, what was the share of each family ?
Number of families = 14
Number of wheat sacks = 8
Weight of each sack = 98 kilos
So the total weight of wheat (98×8)
98
× 8 |
784 |
The total amount of wheat is 784 kilos
Answer = he get more 1140 rupees than he had spent.
5.) Fourteen families in a Society together bought 8 sacks of wheat, each weighing 98 kilos. If they shared all the wheat equally, what was the share of each family ?
Number of families = 14
Number of wheat sacks = 8
Weight of each sack = 98 kilos
So the total weight of wheat (98×8)
98
× 8 |
784 |
The total amount of wheat is 784 kilos
14 families divided them equally so every family got (784 ÷ 14)
6.) The capacity of an overhead water tank is 3000 litres. There are 16 families living in this building. If each family uses 225 litres every day, will the tank filled to capacity be enough for all the families ? If not, what will the daily shortfall be ?
Total capacity of tank = 3000 litres
Number of families use the water of the tank = 16
Water needed for each family = 225 litres
So total amount of water needed for the 16 families (225×16)
Total water needed for 16 families = 3600 litres
So from above we can see,
Water needed > tank’s capacity
3600 litres > 3000 litres
So subtracting the tank’s capacity from the total amount of water (3600-3000)
3
3 |
6
0 |
0
0 |
0
0 |
0 | 6 | 0 | 0 |
Answer = tank will not be enough for all the families.
600 litres will be the daily shortfall.
For More Solutions, Click Below:
Part One:
- Chapter 1 Roman Numerals
- Chapter 2 Number Work
- Chapter 3 Addition and Subtraction
- Chapter 5 Fractions
- Chapter 6 Angles
- Chapter 7 Circles
Part Two:
- Chapter 8 Multiples and Factors
- Chapter 9 Decimal Fractions
- Chapter 10 Measuring Time
- Chapter 11 Problems and Measurement
- Chapter 12 Perimeter and Area
- Chapter 15 Patterns
- Chapter 16 Preparations for Algebra